NY S02013 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4491
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4491
Summary
Makes the director of the state office for the aging a member of the emergency services council.
Title
Makes the director of the state office for the aging a member of the emergency services council.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-01 | SUBSTITUTED BY A4491 | |
2010-02-02 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-02-01 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-01-26 | 1ST REPORT CAL.48 | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | |
2009-07-16 | COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2009-06-04 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-06-03 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2009-06-02 | 1ST REPORT CAL.540 | |
2009-02-10 | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A4491 (Same As) 2010-03-01 - 3RD READING CAL.48
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02013&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |