NY S02010 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-05 - PRINT NUMBER 2010A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-05 - PRINT NUMBER 2010A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the office for small business under the executive department; repeals the division for small-business which was in the economic development law; transfers powers from the division to the office.
Title
Establishes the office for small business under the executive department; repeals the division for small-business which was in the economic development law; transfers powers from the division to the office.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2010A |
2012-01-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2011-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A05800 (Same As) 2011-04-20 - enacting clause stricken