NY S01995 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1297
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1297
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "Rockland Bergen Bi-State Watershed Flood Prevention and Protection Act"; creates the twelve member Rockland Bergen Bi-State River Commission to identify and remediate the potential flood protection hazards along the tributaries and watersheds of the Hackensack River, Mahwah River, Ramapo River, Saddle River and Sparkill Brook/Creek that cross the interstate border region.
Title
Enacts the "Rockland Bergen Bi-State Watershed Flood Prevention and Protection Act"; creates the twelve member Rockland Bergen Bi-State River Commission to identify and remediate the potential flood protection hazards along the tributaries and watersheds of the Hackensack River, Mahwah River, Ramapo River, Saddle River and Sparkill Brook/Creek that cross the interstate border region.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1297 |
2013-05-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.520 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01297 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - tabled