NY S01974 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-10 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-10 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for release of subcontractor's retainage held by a public owner or contractor sixty days after substantial completion of work.
Title
Provides for release of subcontractor's retainage held by a public owner or contractor sixty days after substantial completion of work.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-10 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.715 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2013-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-04-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-04-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.305 |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A01660 (Same As) 2014-06-11 - reported referred to rules