NY S01967 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes former members of the United States public health service to receive a distinguishing mark on their license indicating that they are a veteran.
Title
Authorizes former members of the United States public health service to receive a distinguishing mark on their license indicating that they are a veteran.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.695 |
2017-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |