NY S01966 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides immunity from prosecution for certain individuals engaged in prostitution who are victims of or witnesses to a crime and who report such crime or assist in the investigation or prosecution.
Title
Provides immunity from prosecution for certain individuals engaged in prostitution who are victims of or witnesses to a crime and who report such crime or assist in the investigation or prosecution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-05-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1005 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2023-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A07471 (Same As) 2024-05-09 - advanced to third reading cal.459