NY S01966 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - SIGNED CHAP.249
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the number of physicians who may be appointed to serve as the medical board of the NYC employees' retirement system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases the number of physicians who may be appointed to serve as the medical board of the NYC employees' retirement system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Cities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-11AssemblySIGNED CHAP.249
2019-09-11SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-06-18Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-18Assemblyhome rule request
2019-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.339
2019-06-18Assemblysubstituted for a3593a
2019-06-17Assemblyreferred to governmental employees
2019-06-17SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-17SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-04-29SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-04-10Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-04-09Senate1ST REPORT CAL.405
2019-03-29SenatePRINT NUMBER 1966A
2019-03-29SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES
2019-01-18SenateREFERRED TO CITIES

Same As/Similar To

A03593 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - substituted by s1966a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback