NY S01947 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-07 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-07 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts "Erin Merryn's law"; requires the commissioner of education to make recommendations to the board of regents relating to instruction on preventing child sexual exploitation and child abuse in grades kindergarten through eight.
Title
Enacts "Erin Merryn's law"; requires the commissioner of education to make recommendations to the board of regents relating to instruction on preventing child sexual exploitation and child abuse in grades kindergarten through eight.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | Assembly | referred to education |
2016-03-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-03-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-02-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-02-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.222 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1947B |
2016-01-28 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | referred to education |
2015-05-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-05-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-05-18 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1947A |
2015-02-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-02-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.82 |
2015-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00090 (Same As) 2016-02-02 - print number 90b