NY S01944 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - approval memo.45
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - approval memo.45
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the removal of persons from campgrounds by the owner or operator thereof, or his or her agent; establishes the grounds for removal of persons from a campground; provides for the disposition of abandoned property at a campground.
Title
Provides for the removal of persons from campgrounds by the owner or operator thereof, or his or her agent; establishes the grounds for removal of persons from a campground; provides for the disposition of abandoned property at a campground.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Senate | approval memo.45 |
2019-12-16 | Senate | signed chap.654 |
2019-12-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1754 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1944A |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.325 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | rules report cal.325 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-13 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-11 | Senate | print number 1569a |
2019-06-11 | Senate | amend and recommit to codes |
2019-06-04 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-15 | Senate | referred to judiciary |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1569A |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1754 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1944A |
2019-06-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2019-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A01569 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - approval memo.45