NY S01943 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the election of members of the board of education of the Buffalo city school district in November rather than in May; creates a timetable for the electoral proceedings therefor; extends the terms of current members of such board to the last day of December rather than June; provides for future terms to run from January through December; and staggers terms.
Title
Provides for the election of members of the board of education of the Buffalo city school district in November rather than in May; creates a timetable for the electoral proceedings therefor; extends the terms of current members of such board to the last day of December rather than June; provides for future terms to run from January through December; and staggers terms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO EDUCATION | |
2009-06-11 | PRINT NUMBER 1943A | |
2009-06-11 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION | |
2009-02-10 | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A6028-A (Same As) 2010-06-16 - held for consideration in education