NY S01941 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-16 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-16 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to driving while intoxicated and the installation of interlock ignition devices; provides that where the court finds "good cause" it can sentence a person to wear a transdermal alcohol monitoring device for a period of not less than six months; makes related changes.
Title
Relates to driving while intoxicated and the installation of interlock ignition devices; provides that where the court finds "good cause" it can sentence a person to wear a transdermal alcohol monitoring device for a period of not less than six months; makes related changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-16 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2013-04-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-04-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-02-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-02-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.22 |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A02285 (Same As) 2013-07-26 - signed chap.169