NY S01938 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - PRINT NUMBER 1938A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - PRINT NUMBER 1938A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the offering of the twelve month work exemption to certain parents or relatives in receipt of public assistance who personally provide child care.
Title
Authorizes the offering of the twelve month work exemption to certain parents or relatives in receipt of public assistance who personally provide child care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1938A |
2018-06-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2018-01-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2017-03-01 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A04829 (Same As) 2018-05-30 - amended on third reading 4829a