NY A04829 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-30 - amended on third reading 4829a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-30 - amended on third reading 4829a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the offering of the twelve month work exemption to certain parents or relatives in receipt of public assistance who personally provide child care.
Title
Authorizes the offering of the twelve month work exemption to certain parents or relatives in receipt of public assistance who personally provide child care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Assembly | amended on third reading 4829a |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.341 |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.288 |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.288 |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-02-03 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S01938 (Same As) 2018-06-04 - PRINT NUMBER 1938A