NY S01931 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the transfer of certain pumping stations located in the borough of Queens to the city of New York.
Title
Authorizes the transfer of certain pumping stations located in the borough of Queens to the city of New York.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Cities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Cities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Cities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.183 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | referred to cities |
2017-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.724 |
2017-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A01320 (Same As) 2017-09-27 - enacting clause stricken