NY S01931 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO BANKS
Pending: Senate Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO BANKS
Pending: Senate Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides criteria for membership in credit unions and permits the extension of certain services to nonmembers.
Title
Provides criteria for membership in credit unions and permits the extension of certain services to nonmembers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO BANKS | |
2009-05-04 | PRINT NUMBER 1931A | |
2009-05-04 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BANKS | |
2009-02-10 | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A260-A (Same As) 2010-04-13 - enacting clause stricken