NY S01925 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Removes caps on automated enforcement cameras for bus lanes and traffic lights in the city of New York, increases penalties and creates a graduated schedule of fines for repeat offenders, and directs that fines be deposited in the general transportation account of the New York city transportation assistance fund; extends the effectiveness of part II of chapter 59 of the laws of 2010 amending the vehicle and traffic law and the public officers law relating to establishing a bus rapid transit demonstration program to restrict the use of bus lanes by means of bus lane photo devices.
Title
Removes caps on automated enforcement cameras for bus lanes and traffic lights in the city of New York, increases penalties and creates a graduated schedule of fines for repeat offenders, and directs that fines be deposited in the general transportation account of the New York city transportation assistance fund; extends the effectiveness of part II of chapter 59 of the laws of 2010 amending the vehicle and traffic law and the public officers law relating to establishing a bus rapid transit demonstration program to restrict the use of bus lanes by means of bus lane photo devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1287 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1925B |
2019-06-06 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-05-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1925A |
2019-05-09 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01552 (Same As) 2019-02-28 - enacting clause stricken
A06777 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to transportation
A06777 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to transportation