NY S01891 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-27 - PRINT NUMBER 1891A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-27 - PRINT NUMBER 1891A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts libraries from the imposition of the metropolitan commuter transportation mobility tax.
Title
Exempts libraries from the imposition of the metropolitan commuter transportation mobility tax.
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Martins [R] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. John Bonacic [R] |
Sen. Terry Gipson [D] | Sen. William Larkin [R] | Sen. George Latimer [D] | Sen. Kenneth LaValle [R] |
Sen. Lee Zeldin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1891A |
2014-02-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A01665 (Same As) 2014-03-04 - print number 1665a