NY S01823 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-12 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-12 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a civil cause of action for employees who are subjected to an abusive work environment.
Title
Establishes a civil cause of action for employees who are subjected to an abusive work environment.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Ruth Hassell-Thompson [D] | Sen. Thomas Morahan [R] |
Sen. George Onorato [D] | Sen. Diane Savino [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-12 | referred to labor | |
2010-05-12 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-05-12 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-03-17 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-03-16 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-03-15 | 1ST REPORT CAL.262 | |
2010-02-23 | PRINT NUMBER 1823B | |
2010-02-23 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO LABOR | |
2009-07-16 | COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2009-05-20 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-05-19 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2009-05-18 | 1ST REPORT CAL.343 | |
2009-04-29 | PRINT NUMBER 1823A | |
2009-04-29 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR | |
2009-02-09 | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A5414-B (Same As) 2010-06-08 - held for consideration in labor