NY S01819 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - signed chap.140
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - signed chap.140
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes state and New York city maternal mortality review boards and the maternal mortality and morbidity advisory council for the purpose of reviewing maternal deaths and maternal morbidity and developing and disseminating findings, recommendations, and best practices to contribute to the prevention of maternal mortality and morbidity.
Title
Establishes state and New York city maternal mortality review boards and the maternal mortality and morbidity advisory council for the purpose of reviewing maternal deaths and maternal morbidity and developing and disseminating findings, recommendations, and best practices to contribute to the prevention of maternal mortality and morbidity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-01 | Senate | signed chap.140 |
2019-07-31 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.224 |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1819 |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-03-20 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-03-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-02-21 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.64 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | reported |
2019-02-11 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-11 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-29 | Senate | referred to health |
2019-03-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3276 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.224 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-02-06 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
2019-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A03276 (Same As) 2019-08-01 - signed chap.140