NY S01817 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Mandates the provision of lactation accommodations in airports.
Title
Mandates the provision of lactation accommodations in airports.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Todd Kaminsky [D] |
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Jose Peralta [D] | Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-05-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1817C |
2018-05-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2018-05-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1817B |
2018-05-10 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1817A |
2017-06-13 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2017-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07032 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - REFERRED TO RULES