NY S01809 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-30 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-30 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Mandates attendance by members appointed by the governor at meetings of councils of state-operated institutions.
Title
Mandates attendance by members appointed by the governor at meetings of councils of state-operated institutions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-30 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2012-04-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-04-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-04-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-04-19 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-04-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.531 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-05-16 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2011-05-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-05-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-04-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-04-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.380 |
2011-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |