NY S01803 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - VETOED MEMO.157
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - VETOED MEMO.157
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Promotes efficient and effective oversight of continuing care retirement communities.
Title
Promotes efficient and effective oversight of continuing care retirement communities.
Sponsors
Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.157 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.676 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a8193 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1534 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1803A |
2019-06-10 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2019-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A08193 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - VETOED MEMO.157