NY A08193 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - VETOED MEMO.157
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - VETOED MEMO.157
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Promotes efficient and effective oversight of continuing care retirement communities.
Title
Promotes efficient and effective oversight of continuing care retirement communities.
Sponsors
Asm. Robin Schimminger [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] | Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] |
Asm. Nader Sayegh [D] | Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.157 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.676 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a8193 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1534 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 1803A |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2019-01-16 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s1803a |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.676 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-07 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S01803 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - VETOED MEMO.157