NY S01721 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to providing language access services; requires the workers' compensation board to provide for translation of documents and interpretation services and to publish a language access plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to providing language access services; requires the workers' compensation board to provide for translation of documents and interpretation services and to publish a language access plan.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11Assemblyreferred to labor
2019-03-11SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-03-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-03-07SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-03-06Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-03-05Senate1ST REPORT CAL.223
2019-01-22SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2019-01-16SenateREFERRED TO LABOR

Same As/Similar To

A01327 (Same As) 2019-01-14 - referred to labor

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback