NY S01716 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-14 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-14 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to preventing certain elected officials from being a member of an agency.
Title
Relates to preventing certain elected officials from being a member of an agency.
Sponsors
Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Mario Mattera [R] | Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] |
Sen. Lea Webb [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-14 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2024-05-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-01-31 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-01-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.237 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2023-05-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.799 |
2023-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A00255 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to local governments