NY S01701 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the criminal street gang act; defines offenses; increases penalties; provides for gang prevention programs in schools; establishes the criminal street gang prevention fund; and develops a comprehensive approach to protecting public interests from gang related crime and violence.
Title
Enacts the criminal street gang act; defines offenses; increases penalties; provides for gang prevention programs in schools; establishes the criminal street gang prevention fund; and develops a comprehensive approach to protecting public interests from gang related crime and violence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-02-02 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2015-02-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-02-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-01-26 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.43 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A05106 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to codes