NY S01692 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - SIGNED CHAP.428
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - SIGNED CHAP.428
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to referrals to state adult service agencies for certain students with disabilities who have reached the age of 18.
Title
Relates to referrals to state adult service agencies for certain students with disabilities who have reached the age of 18.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.428 |
2017-11-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.319 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | substituted for a1036 |
2017-03-31 | Assembly | referred to education |
2017-03-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-03-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.364 |
2017-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01036 (Same As) 2017-06-15 - substituted by s1692