NY A01036 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - substituted by s1692
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - substituted by s1692
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to referrals to state adult service agencies for certain students with disabilities who have reached the age of 18.
Title
Relates to referrals to state adult service agencies for certain students with disabilities who have reached the age of 18.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Assembly | substituted by s1692 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.319 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-01-10 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S01692 (Same As) 2017-11-29 - SIGNED CHAP.428