NY S01688 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - signed chap.167
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - signed chap.167
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the regulation of distressed home loans.
Title
Provides for the regulation of distressed home loans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-14 | Senate | signed chap.167 |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.302 |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1688 |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-03-14 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-03-14 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-03-07 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.119 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | reported |
2019-02-27 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-02-14 | Senate | referred to judiciary |
2019-04-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5615 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.302 |
2019-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A05615 (Same As) 2019-08-14 - signed chap.167