NY S01675 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to responsible parties for petroleum contaminated sites and incentives to parties who are willing to remediate such sites; provides that a discharger may present evidence as to third party responsibility for petroleum discharge; provides for apportionment of liability; provides that parties willing to remediate such discharge shall be entitled to liability limitation.
Title
Relates to responsible parties for petroleum contaminated sites and incentives to parties who are willing to remediate such sites; provides that a discharger may present evidence as to third party responsibility for petroleum discharge; provides for apportionment of liability; provides that parties willing to remediate such discharge shall be entitled to liability limitation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2013-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-05-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.460 |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A02065 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to environmental conservation