NY S01658 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - PRINT NUMBER 1658B
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - PRINT NUMBER 1658B
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the regulation of short-term rental units; authorizes short-term rental units; requires short-term rental hosts to register each unit with the division of housing and community renewal.
Title
Relates to the regulation of short-term rental units; authorizes short-term rental units; requires short-term rental hosts to register each unit with the division of housing and community renewal.
Sponsors
Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Sen. Jeremy Cooney [D] | Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. Michelle Hinchey [D] |
Sen. Elijah Reichlin-Melnick [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1658B |
2022-05-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2021-03-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1658A |
2021-03-12 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2021-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06592 (Same As) 2022-05-10 - print number 6592a