NY S01652 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to excluding income from the employment of children when calculating income for the selection of tenants; excludes income from the employment of children under 18 and full-time students over 18 and earnings in excess of $480 per month.
Title
Relates to excluding income from the employment of children when calculating income for the selection of tenants; excludes income from the employment of children under 18 and full-time students over 18 and earnings in excess of $480 per month.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-02-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.351 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-03-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.205 |
2017-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A00269 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to housing