NY S01637 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-15 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the crime of criminal possession of a flamethrower as a class E felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the crime of criminal possession of a flamethrower as a class E felony.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-15SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2020-01-14Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2020-01-13Senate1ST REPORT CAL.58
2020-01-08SenateREFERRED TO CODES
2020-01-08Assemblyreturned to senate
2020-01-08Assemblydied in assembly
2019-06-11Assemblyreferred to codes
2019-06-11SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-11SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1234
2019-06-11SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-01-15SenateREFERRED TO CODES

Same As/Similar To

A07271 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to codes

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback