NY S01596 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A934A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A934A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that the SUNY health science centers are included in the maintenance of effort provision pursuant to chapter 260 of the laws of 2011.
Title
Clarifies that the SUNY health science centers are included in the maintenance of effort provision pursuant to chapter 260 of the laws of 2011.
Sponsors
Sen. Kenneth LaValle [R] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Jesse Hamilton [D] | Sen. Robert Ortt [R] |
Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A934A |
2017-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1998 |
2017-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1596A |
2017-05-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2017-01-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00934 (Same As) 2017-12-18 - tabled