NY S01577 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that services to medical assistance recipients suffering from traumatic brain injuries or qualifying for nursing home diversion and transition services shall be provided outside of managed programs.
Title
Provides that services to medical assistance recipients suffering from traumatic brain injuries or qualifying for nursing home diversion and transition services shall be provided outside of managed programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-03-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-03-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-02-14 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1577A |
2022-01-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-01-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.272 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-05-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.350 |
2021-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A00192 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means