NY S01556 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.394
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.394
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Disallows the cost recovery for membership dues of any entity that engages in legislative lobbying activities.
Title
Disallows the cost recovery for membership dues of any entity that engages in legislative lobbying activities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 108 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-02 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.394 |
2021-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.267 |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | substituted for a6871 |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2021-03-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-01-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-01-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.117 |
2021-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06871 (Same As) 2021-05-05 - substituted by s1556