NY S01531 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the creation and recognition of architectural districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the creation and recognition of architectural districts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2018-02-13SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-02-12Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-02-06Senate1ST REPORT CAL.391
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2017-06-21SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2017-05-01SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2017-04-26Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2017-04-25Senate1ST REPORT CAL.574
2017-01-10SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A01432 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to local governments

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback