NY S01522 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-02 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-02 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a sex offender to state, on a verification form, the name of any school for children in grades pre-kindergarten through twelfth which is located within a one-half mile radius of such offender's place of residence.
Title
Requires a sex offender to state, on a verification form, the name of any school for children in grades pre-kindergarten through twelfth which is located within a one-half mile radius of such offender's place of residence.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeffrey Klein [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Martin Dilan [D] |
Sen. Charles Fuschillo [R] | Sen. John Sampson [D] | Sen. Malcolm Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2012-05-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-05-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-04-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-04-19 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-04-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.540 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2011-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A03187 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to correction