NY S01484 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-02 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-02 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the maximum fine for the misdemeanor of abandonment of animals to $2,000.
Title
Increases the maximum fine for the misdemeanor of abandonment of animals to $2,000.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-02 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2014-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.831 |
2014-01-28 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2013-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1374 |
2013-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1484B |
2013-06-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO AGRICULTURE |
2013-05-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1484A |
2013-05-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO AGRICULTURE |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A09624 (Same As) 2014-05-13 - referred to agriculture