NY S01481 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - referred to mental health
Pending: Assembly Mental Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - referred to mental health
Pending: Assembly Mental Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the powers and duties of the advisory council of the justice center for the protection of people with special needs; adds additional duties relating to investigations of allegations of abuse and neglect.
Title
Relates to the powers and duties of the advisory council of the justice center for the protection of people with special needs; adds additional duties relating to investigations of allegations of abuse and neglect.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2018-04-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-04-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.172 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2017-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.408 |
2017-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A09583 (Same As) 2018-01-23 - referred to mental health