NY S01441 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to exemptions from sales and use taxes for certain fuel, gas, electricity, refrigeration and steam and gas.
Title
Relates to exemptions from sales and use taxes for certain fuel, gas, electricity, refrigeration and steam and gas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.712 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2013-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-05-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-05-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.548 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |