NY S01438 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes constitutional provision that the lieutenant-governor shall act as governor when the governor is absent from the state; provides likewise for the case in which the lieutenant-governor is absent from the state and the case in which the temporary president of the senate is absent from the state.
Title
Removes constitutional provision that the lieutenant-governor shall act as governor when the governor is absent from the state; provides likewise for the case in which the lieutenant-governor is absent from the state and the case in which the temporary president of the senate is absent from the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2024-01-04 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2023-02-07 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2023-01-13 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2023-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A01470 (Same As) 2024-01-26 - opinion referred to judiciary