NY S01422 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-15 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-15 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands eligibility for those who receive awards under crime victims' compensation to include a domestic partner; defines domestic partner; further provides for out-of-pocket loss to include the cost of counseling for surviving family members of homicide victims.
Title
Expands eligibility for those who receive awards under crime victims' compensation to include a domestic partner; defines domestic partner; further provides for out-of-pocket loss to include the cost of counseling for surviving family members of homicide victims.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-15 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2010-03-23 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | |
2010-02-01 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION | |
2009-02-25 | PRINT NUMBER 1422A | |
2009-02-25 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | |
2009-02-23 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | |
2009-01-30 | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A04089 (Same As) 2010-04-21 - REFERRED TO FINANCE