NY S01414 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes certain crimes relating to the criminal manufacture or possession of an undetectable firearm, rifle, or shotgun.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes certain crimes relating to the criminal manufacture or possession of an undetectable firearm, rifle, or shotgun.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-05-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.16
2019-05-20Assemblysubstituted for a763a
2019-05-15Assemblyreferred to codes
2019-05-15SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-15SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-08SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 1414A
2019-01-28SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.87
2019-01-28SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-01-14SenateREFERRED TO CODES

Same As/Similar To

A00763 (Same As) 2019-05-20 - substituted by s1414a

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01414&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01414&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S01414
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01414&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S01414A
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S1414#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S1414#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S1414#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01414&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback