NY A00763 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-1)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - SIGNED CHAP.134
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-1)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - SIGNED CHAP.134
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes certain crimes relating to the criminal manufacture or possession of an undetectable firearm, rifle, or shotgun.
Title
Establishes certain crimes relating to the criminal manufacture or possession of an undetectable firearm, rifle, or shotgun.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-30 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.134 |
2019-07-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-05-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.16 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | substituted for a763a |
2019-05-15 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1414A |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.87 |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | substituted by s1414a |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | amended on third reading 763a |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.16 |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | rules report cal.16 |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-01-10 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S01414 (Same As) 2019-07-30 - SIGNED CHAP.134