NY S01382 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the metropolitan transportation authority and the New York city transit authority to implement certain standards issued by the society for protective coatings pertaining to applying and removing coatings from bridges, trestles, and elevated subway and railway tracks and stations.
Title
Requires the metropolitan transportation authority and the New York city transit authority to implement certain standards issued by the society for protective coatings pertaining to applying and removing coatings from bridges, trestles, and elevated subway and railway tracks and stations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-04-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.772 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2023-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06394 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions