NY S01381 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - SIGNED CHAP.648
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - SIGNED CHAP.648
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a proposed amendment to the constitution or other question provided by law to be submitted to a statewide vote be submitted to the people for their approval in plain language which is deemed to be no higher than an eighth grade reading level.
Title
Requires a proposed amendment to the constitution or other question provided by law to be submitted to a statewide vote be submitted to the people for their approval in plain language which is deemed to be no higher than an eighth grade reading level.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-17 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.648 |
2023-11-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.681 |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | substituted for a1722b |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2023-05-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.777 |
2023-05-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1381A |
2023-05-01 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2023-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A01722 (Same As) 2023-06-08 - substituted by s1381a