NY S01367 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-20 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-20 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes volunteer firefighters from other states to offer and provide their services to fire departments, districts and companies in this state.
Title
Authorizes volunteer firefighters from other states to offer and provide their services to fire departments, districts and companies in this state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-20 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2015-03-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-03-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-03-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.132 |
2015-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A01020 (Same As) 2016-11-28 - tabled