NY S01357 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the advisory council on agriculture to study the co-location of farms and renewable energy projects in an effort to enhance compatibility between renewable energy development and the protection of natural and agricultural resources.
Title
Directs the advisory council on agriculture to study the co-location of farms and renewable energy projects in an effort to enhance compatibility between renewable energy development and the protection of natural and agricultural resources.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-19 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.296 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |