NY S01347 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.548
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.548
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires actual consent to participate in franchise programs for motor vehicle dealers.
Title
Requires actual consent to participate in franchise programs for motor vehicle dealers.
Sponsors
Sen. Martin Dilan [D] | Sen. Ruben Diaz [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.548 |
2011-09-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.37 |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | substituted for a1191 |
2011-04-12 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2011-04-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-04-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-03-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-03-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.130 |
2011-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01191 (Same As) 2011-06-06 - substituted by s1347